Ricciuti, Flora (CPSO#: 66557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
702 - 240 Duncan Mill Rd
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 494-7435
Fax: (416) 494-4819
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flora Ricciuti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ricciuti ( CPSO# 66557 )

Business Address:
702 - 240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 494-7435

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORA RICCIUTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCIUTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1996