Rice, Kevin Mark (CPSO#: 59939)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1992