Rich, Peter (CPSO#: 51874)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Rich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Norfolk General Hospital 365 West Street Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Date Received: 19 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017