Richard, Julie Carla (CPSO#: 82661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8102
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie C. Richard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richard ( CPSO# 82661 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
Room A2-630
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8102

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE CARLA RICHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011