Richard, Michael Thomas (CPSO#: 18068)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2013