Richard, Thomas Charles (CPSO#: 58223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4500
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas C. Richard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Richard ( CPSO# 58223 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4500

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES RICHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988