Richards, Burke Alfred (CPSO#: 14875)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2003

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Dec 1991
Summary:

In December 1991, Dr. Richards pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as 
defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to 
s. 27(32).  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Richards guilty of 
professional misconduct.   Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Richards be 
reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee 
further ordered that Dr. Richards  licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, 
but that this suspension would itself be suspended on the following terms and conditions: 
 
   1. At the first available date, Dr. Richards was to complete, at his own expense, the PREP 
      and, if necessary, the Physician Enhancement Program, all to the satisfaction of the 
      Registrar. 
 
   2. Dr. Richards was to consult with the Deputy Registrar of the College regarding an 
      appropriate assessment of his knowledge, skill and judgment in respect of the diagnosis 
      and treatment of chest disease. 
 
   3. Dr. Richards was to be referred by the Deputy Registrar of the College to a Chest and 
      Allergy Unit at a teaching hospital for retraining in chest disease. 
 
   4. Dr. Richards was to consent to the release by the College to the Chest and Allergy Unit 
      clinic of any information considered appropriate by the Deputy Registrar prior to Dr. 
      Richards  retraining program. 
 
   5. Dr. Richards was to attend at the clinic and was to cooperate in every respect with the 
      assessment provided by that clinic.  Dr. Richards was to consent to the release by the 
      clinic to the College of any information with respect to the retraining and the result of the 
      retraining as might be considered necessary by the Deputy Registrar. 
 
   6. If, in the judgment of the Registrar of the College, Dr. Richards failed to comply with 
      these terms and conditions to the satisfaction of the Registrar, the full penalty of 
      suspension, as cited above, was to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, not to 
      exceed sixty days from the date on which the default in the opinion of the Registrar had 
      occurred. 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 03 Dec 1991