Richards, Christine Patricia (CPSO#: 55396)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008