Richards, Douglas Lorne (CPSO#: 68941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

St. Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-4941
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richards ( CPSO# 68941 )
Dr. C. Munn ( CPSO# 69409 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0721

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LORNE RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997