Richards, Frank (CPSO#: 21715)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1989
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 1989
Summary:

 In March 1989, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Richards guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Richards be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also 
 ruled that there be a permanent restriction on the Doctor's licence, to the effect that he be 
 prohibited from practicing anaesthesia.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 06 Mar 1989