Richards, Gail Janice Emily (CPSO#: 55711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]

                  
            As from October 12, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gail Janice Emily
            Richards, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Richards
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Richards has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 27, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gail Janice Emily Richards to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 27, 2016:

Dr. Richards has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine, on an interim basis, and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.