Richards, John Gordon Lippincott (CPSO#: 62160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110-112 Woolwich Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3V2
Phone: (519) 837-3896
Fax: (519) 837-1916
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Gordon L. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richards ( CPSO# 62160 )

Business Address:
75 Wyndham Street South
Guelph ON  N1E 5R3
Phone Number: (519) 265-4848

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON LIPPINCOTT RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1991