Richards, Larry Marshall (CPSO#: 20919)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1997