Richards, Robert Stanley (CPSO#: 52929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6046
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

354 WINDERMERE
London ON  N6G 2K2
Canada
Phone: 5198580085
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

460 SPRINGBANK DR
SUITE 314
London ON  N6J 0A8
Canada
Phone: 5196728364
Fax: 5196720607
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Richards ( CPSO# 52929 )

Business Address:
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STANLEY RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1991