Richardson, Beverley J (CPSO#: 26438)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert M.A. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Box 161 27 St Clair Avenue East Toronto ON M4T 2L7, or Health Records Department Women's College Hospital 76 Grenville Street Toronto ON M5S 1B1
Instructions: Medical records prior to November 2011 are stored at the St Clair Avenue East address. Records after November 2011 are stored at the Women's College Hospital address.
Date Received: 12 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Dec 2015