Richardson, Bonnie Rosemarie (CPSO#: 89793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE ROSEMARIE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2008 to 20 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015