Richardson, Christine Ann (CPSO#: 77806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
L H S C - V H
Room E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Ann Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Richardson ( CPSO# 77806 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
L H S C - Victoria Hospital
Room E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004