Richardson, David Campbell (CPSO#: 70399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Department of Infectious Diseases
and Medical Microbiology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57658
Fax: (905) 494-6506
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson ( CPSO# 70399 )
Dr. M. Richardson ( CPSO# 69321 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CAMPBELL RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000