Richardson, Denise Louise (CPSO#: 65157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN- Toronto Rehab
10-107
550 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3522 Ext. 3865
Fax: 416-597-7107
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.L. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson ( CPSO# 65157 )

Business Address:
UNH - Toronto Rehab
Suite 10-107
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE LOUISE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993