Richardson, Devon Paula (CPSO#: 96814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Toronto ON  M5G1E2
Phone: 4165970997
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVON PAULA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 29 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013