Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Richardson, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 60890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 King St W
2nd floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 4S6
Phone: (905) 546-2424 Ext. 3501
Fax: (905) 546-4075
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1992