Richardson, George Murdoch John (CPSO#: 58501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE MURDOCH JOHN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988