Richardson, Joseph Donald (CPSO#: 65087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Hospital
Operation Stress Inquiry Clinic
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4292 Ext. 42399
Fax: (519) 685-4585
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anxiety Treatment & Research Clinic
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Site
100 West 5th Street Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34964
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Donald Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richardson ( CPSO# 65087 )

Business Address:
Anxiety Treatment & Research Clinic
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Site
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Parkwood Hospital
Operation Stress Inquiry Clinic
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4292

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH DONALD RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1992