Richardson, Maria (CPSO#: 69321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Yorkland Blvd
Unit 403
North York ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2008

Dr. D. Richardson ( CPSO# 70399 )
Dr. M. Richardson ( CPSO# 69321 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARIA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997