Richardson, Martha Victoria (CPSO#: 63922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
777 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1H 4K5
Phone: (905) 721-0003
Fax: (905) 721-0618
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa ON  L1H 4G2
Canada
Phone: 905-720-0506
Fax: 905-720-0787
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA VICTORIA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992