Richardson, Peter Murray (CPSO#: 22323)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2011