Richardson, Peter (CPSO#: 19855)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Durham, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2002
Summary:

On June 26, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario, having found that Dr. Richardson committed an act of professional misconduct for an 
act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, 
would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, 
directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Richardson attend before this panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 
 
3.    The undertaking, signed by Dr. Richardson, that he will not apply for a certificate of 
      registration or license to practice medicine in Canada, be placed on the public register. 
 
4.    Dr. Richardson to pay part of the College s costs, fixed in the amount of $1,250.00 by 
      August 26, 2002. 
 
The other allegations of professional misconduct including the allegation of sexual abuse and the 
allegation of incompetence were withdrawn by counsel for the College. 
 
Dr. Richardson signed the following undertaking on June 18, 2002: 
 
I, Dr. Peter Richardson, hereby acknowledge and confirm to the College of Physicians and 
Surgeons of Ontario (CPSO) that in 2000 I retired from the active practise of medicine and I have 
resigned my certificate of registration to practice medicine in this province and that I do not have 
any other certificate or license to practise medicine in any other Canadian Province or Territory. 
 
I, Dr. Peter Richardson, hereby undertake to the CPSO that I will not apply to the College for 
reinstatement of my certificate of registration or another certificate of registration to practise 
medicine in Ontario, nor will I apply to any Canadian licensing body for a license or certificate to 
practise medicine at any time or under any circumstances. 
 
I, Dr. Peter Richardson, expressly consent to the CPSO placing the information found in this 
undertaking on the public register kept under s.23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code. 
 
I, Dr. Peter Richardson, have read this undertaking, have received legal advice and confirm that I 
understand the significance of what I am undertaking to do and the consequences of disobeying 
my undertaking. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 26, 2002

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: June 18, 2002
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 18, 2002, Dr. Peter Richardson undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario that he will not apply to this College for reinstatement of his certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario, and that he will not apply to
any Canadian licensing authority for a license or certificate to practise medicine at any
time or under any circumstance.