Richardson, Robert Murray Arthur (CPSO#: 26439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 8N-861
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3889
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert M.A. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MURRAY ARTHUR RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1974