Richardson, Timothy John (CPSO#: 23894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C2
142 Pears Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1T2
Phone: (416) 925-2680
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave. East
Timmins
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tim Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1971