Richman-Eisenstat, Janice Beth Yeved (CPSO#: 54279)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2002