Richmond, Hugh (CPSO#: 41414)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Sep 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006