Richmond, Lara Danielle (CPSO#: 81154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Medical Imaging, M6-252
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Lara Richmond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M6-252
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA DANIELLE RICHMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009