Richter, Kristin Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
285 Bridge Street
Port Stanley ON  N5L 1J5
Phone: (519) 782-4195
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristin Richter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Richter ( CPSO# 100988)

Business Address:
285 Bridge Street
Port Stanley ON  N5L 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 782-4195

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN ELIZABETH RICHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2015