Richter, Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 55417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room FG42
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6832
Fax: (416) 480-5866
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE RICHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1987