Riddell, Gareth James Owen (CPSO#: 90245)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 25 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009