Riddell, James Edgar Theodore (CPSO#: 91472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department Of Anesthesia
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4421
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E.T. Riddell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Riddell ( CPSO# 91472 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EDGAR THEODORE RIDDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDDELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014