Riddle, Robert James (CPSO#: 25191)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 16, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 19, 2013, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College that Dr. Robert J. Riddle's privileges were suspended, effective December 16, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Riddle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 23, 2016:

Dr. Riddle was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his standard of practice and his conduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Riddle has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)