Rideout, William Eric (CPSO#: 74731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613 404 6461
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ERIC RIDEOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDEOUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2002