Ridi, Angela (CPSO#: 83089)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 29 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2007