Ridi, Stacy (CPSO#: 84478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Ridi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 7
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACY RIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011