Ridley, Julia Zarina (CPSO#: 88401)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dance Ridley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 13 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016