Ridout, Rowena (CPSO#: 59445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6454
Fax: (416) 603-5518
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Osteoporosis Program
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-3890
Fax: (416) 340-4707
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROWENA RIDOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDOUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1989