Rieckenberg, Roland Markus (CPSO#: 61392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 3525
Fax: (705) 330-3225
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rieckenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rieckenberg ( CPSO# 61392 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND MARKUS RIECKENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIECKENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989