Rieder, Michael John (CPSO#: 52862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western
Ontario
Paediatric Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8293
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Rieder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rieder ( CPSO# 52862 )
Dr. S. Rieder ( CPSO# 98478 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics Suite B1-437
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8293

Business Address:
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 891-6027

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN RIEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1985