Riegert, Daniel Gerald (CPSO#: 30104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M3 210
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Riegert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Riegert ( CPSO# 30104 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M3-210 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4799

Business Address:
Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL GERALD RIEGERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEGERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 31 Dec 1977
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978