Riekenbrauck, Neal Werner (CPSO#: 63830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwater Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 519-941-2702
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal W. Riekenbrauck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Riekenbrauck ( CPSO# 63830 )

Business Address:
Headwater Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2702

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEAL WERNER RIEKENBRAUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEKENBRAUCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992