Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Riese, Nichole Margaret Marie (CPSO#: 54491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Addictions Foundation of Manitoba
1041 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0W3
Phone: (204)944-6229
Fax: (204) 284-2250

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLE MARGARET MARIE RIESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIESE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1986