Rifkind, Naomi Devorah (CPSO#: 77723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 3N9
Phone: (416) 739-1562
Fax: (416) 739-6671
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 May 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI DEVORAH RIFKIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIFKIND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2005