Rigby, Megan Cheryl (CPSO#: 66412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
140 Oxford Road East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 850-3234
Fax: (519) 850-3238
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey McNamara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rigby ( CPSO# 66412 )
Dr. J. McNamara ( CPSO# 70085 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN CHERYL RIGBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIGBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995