Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rigg, Wesley Donald (CPSO#: 23865)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 3 55 Hampden Road Nedlands WA 6009 Australia
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1969 to 14 Jun 1970
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2014